Hadden, Curtis Magil (CPSO#: 100522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Perry Medical Associates
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 825-8568
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CURTIS MAGIL HADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015