Cacic, Ivan (CPSO#: 84266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3946
Fax: (905) 813-1515
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-5573
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-0058
Fax: (905) 275-1686
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cacic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fedak-Tarnopolsky ( CPSO# 88499 )
Dr. I. Cacic ( CPSO# 84266 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-5573

Business Address:
4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 275-0058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN CACIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011