Cadotte, Helene (CPSO#: 78932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 738-6990 Ext. 226
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Cadotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cadotte ( CPSO# 78932 )

Business Address:
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENE CADOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADOTTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2003