Cameron, Bruce Douglas (CPSO#: 75492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Maurice Crescent
Dieppe NB  E1A 8R2
Canada
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE DOUGLAS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010