Campbell, Melanie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-2161
Fax: (905) 721-2246
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Campbell ( CPSO# 86712 )

Business Address:
Tuanton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ELIZABETH CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014