Caperchione, Ruth Irene (CPSO#: 83281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Dowe, Ruth Irene (used until: 05 Aug 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
154 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Z2
Phone: 519-842-3682
Fax: 519-842-8711
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: 5196312030
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Tillsonburg District Memorial Hosp
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 688-1031
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruth I. Caperchione Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Caperchione ( CPSO# 83281 )

Business Address:
154 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 4J1
Phone Number: (519) 842-3682

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N9G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH IRENE CAPERCHIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPERCHIONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007