Carlisle, Corine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: Ellis, Corine Elizabeth (used until: 06 May 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
790 Bay Street
Mail Box #20
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 901-4352
Fax: (416) 901-4392
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stella's Place
18 Camden Street
Toronto ON  M5V 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-461-2345
Fax: 844-321-8486
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINE ELIZABETH CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2002