Carrigan, Svetlana Olegovna (CPSO#: 97652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Vladivostok State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3057
Fax: (705) 330-3225
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Carrigan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carrigan ( CPSO# 97652 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA OLEGOVNA CARRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017