Carter, Monica Gayle (CPSO#: 90771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Marks St
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone: 807-597-2721
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

278 Front St
Hornepayne ON  P0M1Z0
Canada
Phone: 807-868-2442
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA GAYLE CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011