Cashin, Megan Stephanie (CPSO#: 81526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8021
Fax: (519) 685-8038
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Cashin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cashin ( CPSO# 81526 )

Business Address:
Suite B1-186
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN STEPHANIE CASHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011