Cassim, Essop Moosajee (CPSO#: 22410)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.M. Cassim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014