Cervantes Hernandez, Alejandra (CPSO#: 99514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Autonomus University of Chihuahua, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: 705 544 2321
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Cervantes Hernandez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cervantes Hernandez ( CPSO# 99514 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 544-2321

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA CERVANTES HERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVANTES HERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2015