Chahal, Ramandeep Singh (CPSO#: 94070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Bangalore University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8186
Fax: (519) 272-8226
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Mental Health
Outpatient Services
285 Sarah St. N
Listowel ON  N4W 2Y8
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-1320
Fax: (519) 291-9662
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

OCCHC, 35 Metcalf Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 539-1111
Fax: (519) 539-9111
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramandeep Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chahal ( CPSO# 94070 )

Business Address:
35 Metcalfe Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Phone Number: (519) 539-1111

Business Address:
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 272-8186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMANDEEP SINGH CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013