Chaklader, Mohsina (CPSO#: 85937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

99 Firvalley Ct
Scarborough ON  M1L 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416 694 7400
Fax: 416 694 7401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 320
790 Bay st
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416 613 5050
Fax: 416 613 5051
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohsina Chaklader Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chaklader ( CPSO# 85937 )

Business Address:
320 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 613-5050

Business Address:
99 Firvalley Court
Scarborough ON  M1L 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 694-7400

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 652-5500

Business Address:
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHSINA CHAKLADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKLADER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 04 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Jun 2008 to 29 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 18 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012