Chakraborty, Santanu (CPSO#: 83326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chakraborty ( CPSO# 83326 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Oct 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Santanu Chakraborty may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Chakraborty holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of   registration   automatically   expires   when  Dr.
                  Chakraborty  no  longer  holds  the academic appointment, referred to  in
                  clause 1.