Chakravertty, Rajesh (CPSO#: 82440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 City Centre Drive
Suite 420
Mississauga ON  L5B2N5
Phone: (905) 569-7952
Fax: 905-828-5136
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajesh Chakravertty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chakravertty ( CPSO# 82440 )

Business Address:
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 406
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-7952

Business Address:
420 - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2W5
Phone Number: (905) 569-7952

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH CHAKRAVERTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRAVERTTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010