Champion, Gerard (CPSO#: 74942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone: (705) 267-5600
Fax: (705) 268-7244
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerard Champion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Champion ( CPSO# 74942 )

Business Address:
1 - 681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone Number: (705) 267-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002