Chan, Anita Yuen Man (CPSO#: 95791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: 416-926-1593
Fax: 416-926-8768
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 218
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 416-928-3467
Fax: 416-928-3502
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 101
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Canada
Phone: 519-805-3560
Fax: 519-805-3561
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA YUEN MAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015