Chan, Danny De Hao (CPSO#: 109311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone: (416) 492-7700
Fax: (416) 492-5776
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Reactivation Care Centre
2111 Finch Ave West
Toronto ON  M3N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 744-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ground Floor
741 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3Y3
Canada
Phone: 416-463-2438
Fax: 416-463-2526
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chan ( CPSO# 109311)

Business Address:
Suite 303
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 492-7700

Business Address:
Reactivation Care Centre
2111 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 744-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY DE HAO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018