Chan, Justine Siu-Bun (CPSO#: 91699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
General Internal Medicine
Box 209
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 13056
Fax: 613-761-4186
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justine S. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 91699 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Box 210
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite D103B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-1555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTINE SIU-BUN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013