Chan, Toby Yiu Bong (CPSO#: 85025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-1313
Fax: (519) 742-3662
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Advanced Vision Centre
230 Victoria St
London ON  N6A 2C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 873-1611
Fax: (519) 873-1691
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Suite 7
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Canada
Phone: (519) 658-6801
Fax: (519) 658-6800
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Toby Y B Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chan ( CPSO# 85025 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Phone Number: (519) 658-6801

Business Address:
Suite 411
564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-1313

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOBY YIU BONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011