Chang, Lily (CPSO#: 31237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1979

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greenstone Endoscopy Clinic
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416 222 5501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Promed Endoscopy clinic
1315 Finch Ave West
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: 416 634 0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lafontaine/ Medical Research Group
890 Yonge Street
1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4H 3P4
Canada
Phone: (416) 962 4444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

40 Holly St. #301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: 416 486 8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 551 6006
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Forest hill Institute of Aesthetics
1188 B Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 7857564
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Polyclinic Family & Specialty Clini
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
330 highway 7 east
Suite # 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: 905 7075007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Kensington Screening Centre
340 College St.
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416 928 9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Castlemore endoscopy & digestive
10 Cottrelle BLVd
Suite 207
Brampton ON  L6S 8E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 794-4497
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Downsview Endoscopy clinic
#201
1635 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M6L3C9
Canada
Phone: 416 630 7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York diagnostic endoscopy Clinic
3585 Keele street
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: 416 398 2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Can-Am HIFU
#1401
123 Edward Street
North York ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416 924 9542
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Richmond Hill Surgical Center
Level 2 Unit 12
9080 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9
Canada
Phone: 289 597 8686
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lily Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chang ( CPSO# 31237 )

Business Address:
302 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 27, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 27, 2017, Humber River Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, and s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Lily Chang has voluntarily agreed not to practise at Humber River Hospital during the course of an investigation by Humber River Hospital into Dr. Chang’s anaesthesia practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1979

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)