Charland, David Andre (CPSO#: 93587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Charland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Charland ( CPSO# 93587 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4221

Medical Records Location

Address: Medica One 2079 Lakeshore Rd Burlington, ON L7R 1E2 Tel: 905-634-1625 Fax: 905-634-5332
Instructions: Patients should contact Medica One to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE CHARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012