Chau, Edmond Hung Leong (CPSO#: 91506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit GLB 1
50 Old Mill Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W1
Phone: (416) 356-5764
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chau ( CPSO# 91506 )

Business Address:
Suite GLB1
50 Old Mill Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W1
Phone Number: (416) 356-5764

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMOND HUNG LEONG CHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014