Chaudhari, Prashant Atmaram (CPSO#: 70018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
320 Byron Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone: (905) 668-5835
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prashant Chaudhari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chaudhari ( CPSO# 70018 )

Business Address:
200 - 320 Byron Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 668-5835

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASHANT ATMARAM CHAUDHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998