Chawla, Anjana (CPSO#: 84905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 6415
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
500 Church street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Canada
Phone: 1-877-341-4729
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjana Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 84905 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Waypoint Center For Mental Health
Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJANA CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007