Chawla, Ashis Kumar (CPSO#: 76411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (647) 435-8831
Fax: (416) 767-0992
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashis Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 76411 )
Dr. A. Tandon ( CPSO# 76373 )

Business Address:
501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (647) 435-8831

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6126


Corporation Name: Dr. Anu Tandon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 76411 )
Dr. A. Tandon ( CPSO# 76373 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHIS KUMAR CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006