Chawla, Jasmeet Singh (CPSO#: 80616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SUITE 120
1130 MORRISON DRIVE
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. and R. Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chawla ( CPSO# 80616 )
Dr. R. Chawla ( CPSO# 80745 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4842

Business Address:
120 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 820-5050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASMEET SINGH CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 29 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005