Chen, Adam Yung-Han (CPSO#: 62097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7-225 Speers Rd
Oakville ON  L6K 0J4
Phone: (289) 837-1661
Fax: (905) 569-6187
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chen & Sato Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sato ( CPSO# 63581 )
Dr. A. Chen ( CPSO# 62097 )

Business Address:
Speers Medical
7 - 225 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6K 0J4
Phone Number: (289) 837-1661

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM YUNG-HAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1991