Chen, Chien Hung (CPSO#: 81397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Montreal, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chien Hung Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015