Chen, Robert Chun-Chih (CPSO#: 72372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
2943 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3N9
Phone: (905) 303-4657
Fax: (905) 303-3708
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Upper Thornhill Urgent Care Walk-in
Suite 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-8880
Fax: (905) 417-5803
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert C.C. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen ( CPSO# 72372 )

Business Address:
Unit 9
2943 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3N9
Phone Number: (905) 303-4657

Business Address:
Unit 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-8880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHUN-CHIH CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000