Cheng, Joan Fuji (CPSO#: 66459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7003
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 63601 )
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 66459 )

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7003


Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 63601 )
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 66459 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN FUJI CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995