Cheng, Julianna Veronica Marie (CPSO#: 85548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: Borbely, Julianna Veronica Marie (used until: 28 Jan 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13390 Lanoue Street
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5E1
Phone: 519-735-8100
Fax: 519-735-8101
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
MET Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julianna Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 85548 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
13390 Lanoue Street
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5E1
Phone Number: (519) 735-8100

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIANNA VERONICA MARIE CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2015