Cheung, John Patrick (CPSO#: 69073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John P. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 21 2013


Corporation Name: John Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheung ( CPSO# 69073 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Suite 311
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Cheung in
            accordance with a voluntary consent and undertaking given by Dr. Cheung to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                              
                  Dr. Cheung has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. John Patrick Cheung to the College off Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 30, 2018:

Dr. Cheung has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.