Cheung, Vincent Siu-Jean (CPSO#: 67979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive, Room 2603
Nephrology
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5147
Fax: (705) 876-5178
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive, W5 Dialysis Unit
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-5078
Fax: (705) 876-5079
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Cheung ( CPSO# 67979 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5078

Business Address:
Dialysis Management Clinics
815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7735

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT SIU-JEAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1999