Chhibber, Siddharth (CPSO#: 89738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: 519 672 5270
Fax: 519-672-4459
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siddharth Chhibber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhibber ( CPSO# 89738 )

Business Address:
104 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
R.R. #3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0

Business Address:
90 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8

Business Address:
1657 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 3C6

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Business Address:
230 First Street
Suite 119
St Thomas ON  N5P 4P5

Business Address:
Suite 3
2 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0

Business Address:
268 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0

Business Address:
857 Grand Avenue West
Suite 112
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1

Business Address:
433 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H2

Business Address:
21 McGivern Street West
Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0

Business Address:
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6

Business Address:
39 - 2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0L 1L0

Business Address:
320 College Street
Box 638
Durham ON  N0G 1E0

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2

Business Address:
22262 Mill Road
R.R. #5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0

Business Address:
1609 Stittsville Main
Ottawa ON  K2S 1N5

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9

Business Address:
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDDHARTH CHHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHIBBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 13 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014