Chitte, Sachin Anil (CPSO#: 83907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Fax: (613) 729-3838
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Chitte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chitte ( CPSO# 83907 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone Number: (613) 729-1616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SACHIN ANIL CHITTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008