Cho, Brian (CPSO#: 74034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Pearl St
Mississauga ON  L5M 1X2
Phone: (647) 729-4447
Fax: 905-542-3107
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hong Fook Mental Health Association
3rd Floor
130 Dundas St. W.
Toronto ON  M7A 2C7
Canada
Phone: 416-493-4242
Fax: 416-595-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Cho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cho ( CPSO# 74034 )

Business Address:
34 Pearl Street
Mississauga ON  L5M 1X2
Phone Number: (647) 729-4447

Business Address:
130 Dundas Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M7A 2C7
Phone Number: (416) 493-4242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004