Choi, Abram (CPSO#: 82683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke, ON
K8A 1G8
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: 613-732-2811 Ext. 8096
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Choi ( CPSO# 82683 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAM CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010