Chong, Aun Yeong (CPSO#: 89458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2013

Expiry Date:  28 May 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7280
Fax: (613) 696 7245
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lim ( CPSO# 88120 )
Dr. A. Chong ( CPSO# 89458 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7280

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 29 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Aun Yeong Chong may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Chong
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Chong  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Chong's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Chong's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  May  29,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended  by  the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 28, 2020.