Chou, Andrew (CPSO#: 95740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
625 Queen St. East - Unit 108
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-3064
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ryerson Medical Centre
Kerr Hall West 181
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
Fax: (416) 979-5073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013