Chou, Roger (CPSO#: 89351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 4806100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roger Chou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jong ( CPSO# 86536 )
Dr. R. Chou ( CPSO# 89351 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014