Chu, Kelly Shan-Lin (CPSO#: 82737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 268-9928
Fax: (888) 972-4226
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu ( CPSO# 82737 )

Business Address:
406 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-9928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY SHAN-LIN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011