Chun, Soojin (CPSO#: 91247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Division of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613-722-6521
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elliott Kyung Lee and Soojin Chun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee ( CPSO# 83106 )
Dr. S. Chun ( CPSO# 91247 )

Business Address:
3127 - 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOOJIN CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2016