Chypchar, Tatiana Stephanie (CPSO#: 66541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.S. Chypchar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chypchar ( CPSO# 66541 )

Business Address:
332-829 Norwest Road
Kingston ON  K7P 2N3
Phone Number: (226) 972-5717

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TATIANA STEPHANIE CHYPCHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHYPCHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Nov 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Mar 1997
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003