Cipolletti, Adriana Alexandra (CPSO#: 77918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 Grey Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipolletti Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyke ( CPSO# 75135 )
Dr. A. Cipolletti ( CPSO# 77918 )

Business Address:
36 Grey Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-9940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA ALEXANDRA CIPOLLETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPOLLETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004