Clark, Kenneth Christopher (CPSO#: 73659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chris Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Clark ( CPSO# 73659 )

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH CHRISTOPHER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001