Cleiman, Paula Feigenbaum (CPSO#: 88902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
UHN Division of Emergency
Room G S 480 R F E
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paula F. Cleiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cleiman ( CPSO# 88902 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
UHN Division of Emergency
200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA FEIGENBAUM CLEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011