Clement, Sylvianne (CPSO#: 93768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 945-1458
Fax: (613) 945-1444
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvianne Clement Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Clement ( CPSO# 93768 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1458

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIANNE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012