Cohen-Lyons, Phillip Daniel (CPSO#: 93988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 4164504849
Fax: 4163521729
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen-Lyons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cohen-Lyons ( CPSO# 93988 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP DANIEL COHEN-LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-LYONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014